U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01931
  • Case Name: Jumpp v. McKenzie et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • April 25, 2025: [Response]
  • April 25, 2025: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 24, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Objection]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Response]
  • April 09, 2025: [Response]
  • April 01, 2025: [Objection]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 01, 2025: [Reconsideration]
March, 2025
  • March 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
February, 2025
  • February 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.