U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00290
  • Case Name: Krause v. TechOperators, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • April 24, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 14, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 10, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 24, 2025: [Dismiss]
February, 2025
  • February 28, 2025: [Standing Protective Order (Intake)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.