U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00012
  • Case Name: Federal Trade Commission et al v. Chase Nissan LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • April 21, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • April 21, 2025: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Seal]
  • April 21, 2025: [Preclude]
  • April 21, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 14, 2025: [Response]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • April 14, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Objection]
  • April 11, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.