U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00105
  • Case Name: Yale New Haven Health Services Corporation v. Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Response]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • April 08, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 08, 2025: [Expedite]
  • April 04, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • April 04, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 21, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • March 21, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 19, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 04, 2025: [Sealed Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.