U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01487
  • Case Name: Baltas v. Snyder et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • May 07, 2025: [Compel]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 28, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • April 15, 2025: [Objection]
  • April 14, 2025: [Objection]
  • April 02, 2025: [Objection]
  • April 02, 2025: [Disqualify Counsel]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Stay]
  • March 21, 2025: [Objection]
  • March 21, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • March 18, 2025: [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 17, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 14, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 11, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • March 11, 2025: [Objection]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.