U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01849
  • Case Name: Roger v. Semple et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Sanctions]
  • April 30, 2025: [Contempt]
  • April 22, 2025: [Sanctions]
  • April 22, 2025: [Contempt]
  • April 22, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Clarification]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Contempt]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Default Entry 55(a)]
  • April 08, 2025: [Clarification]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Default Entry 55(a)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Expedite]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.