U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00337
  • Case Name: LaForge v. Bureau of Prison et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 25, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 25, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 24, 2025: [Letter]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Prisoner E-Filing Order (Intake)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Standing Protective Order (Intake)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.