U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01900
  • Case Name: Zavala Martinez et al v. Manzana, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 28, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 04, 2025: [Status Report]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 12, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 11, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.