U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-01486
  • Case Name: Clarkin v. URU The Right To Be, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Settlement]
  • April 01, 2025: [Settlement Agreement]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • March 25, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • March 25, 2025: [Seal]
  • March 19, 2025: [Settlement]
  • March 11, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.