U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01787
  • Case Name: Gal-Invent Korlatolt Felelossegu Tarsasag v. Vanessa Research Holdings, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 18, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • April 16, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice]
  • April 10, 2025: [Default Judgment]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Default Entry 55(a)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.