U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00338
  • Case Name: USA v. $736,040.00 in United States Currency et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • April 30, 2025: [Decree of Forfeiture]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 29, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 29, 2025: [Judgment - Default]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • April 23, 2025: [Default Judgment]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Default Entry 55(a)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Default Entry 55(a)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Service by Publication]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Warrant Returned]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.