U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00335
  • Case Name: Wilson v. Kercelius
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [USCA Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Clerk's Certificate re: Notice of Appeal]
  • April 03, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on ExParte Motion]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 26, 2025: [ExParte Motion]
  • March 11, 2025: [Standing Order re: Letters]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Standing Protective Order (Intake)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.