U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00295
  • Case Name: MacKeeber Associates, LLC v. Town of South Windsor et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 16, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • April 04, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 20, 2025: [Proposed Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 17, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 13, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 13, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 12, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Lis Pendens]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement]
  • March 12, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.