U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00339
  • Case Name: RKR Capital LLC v. Grand Incentives, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Default Entry 55(a)]
  • May 06, 2025: [Default Entry 55(a)]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • April 08, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 20, 2025: [Electronic Summons Reissued]
  • March 20, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 19, 2025: [Request to Issue Summons]
  • March 19, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 10, 2025: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake)]
  • March 10, 2025: [Standing Protective Order (Intake)]
  • March 10, 2025: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.