U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00341
  • Case Name: North Bay Imports, Inc. v. Dowd Agencies, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 17, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement]
  • April 16, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Conference]
  • April 10, 2025: [Response]
  • April 08, 2025: [Response]
  • April 03, 2025: [Conference]
  • April 01, 2025: [Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • March 17, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • March 11, 2025: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • March 10, 2025: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake)]
  • March 10, 2025: [Standing Protective Order (Intake)]
  • March 10, 2025: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.