U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00211
  • Case Name: Plastic and Reconstructive Surgery Group et al v. AETNA, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • April 30, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • April 30, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 29, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 17, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 17, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 16, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • April 08, 2025: [Request to Issue Summons]
  • April 08, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 20, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 18, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 14, 2025: [Response]
  • March 14, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 13, 2025: [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 11, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 10, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 10, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.