U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00176
  • Case Name: Donahue v. Community Health Center, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 22, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 21, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 21, 2025: [Complaint]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Response]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • March 28, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 21, 2025: [Objection]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 14, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice]
  • March 11, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 10, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.