U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00348
  • Case Name: Stehl et al v. Cretella
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • May 07, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 23, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 15, 2025: [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 20, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 18, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 18, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 18, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 14, 2025: [Standing Protective Order (Intake)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order of Transfer]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 11, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 11, 2025: [NEW Case Assignment]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice re: Disclosure Statement]
  • March 10, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.