U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00159
  • Case Name: Doe v. Yale University et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • April 09, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 08, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
  • April 07, 2025: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 04, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 03, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • April 02, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Proceed in Fictitious Name]
  • March 24, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 20, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Clarification]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 18, 2025: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 18, 2025: [Clarification]
  • March 18, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 12, 2025: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 12, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 12, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • March 12, 2025: [Seal]
  • March 12, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 11, 2025: [Calendar Entry - Motion Hearing]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 10, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 10, 2025: [Seal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.