U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00307
  • Case Name: Vernon et al v. Discover Bank et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 08, 2025: [Objection]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 19, 2025: [Remand to State Court]
  • March 18, 2025: [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 12, 2025: [Remand to State Court]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 10, 2025: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.