U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00125
  • Case Name: Barnard v. C&S Wholesale Grocers, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement]
  • March 21, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order]
  • March 10, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.