U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00131
  • Case Name: Steele v. Solar Turbines, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • May 05, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 05, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 09, 2025: [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: [Stay]
  • March 18, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 17, 2025: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • March 17, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 10, 2025: [Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.