U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00252
  • Case Name: Graciano v. Wynn Massachusetts, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
April, 2025
  • April 26, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 22, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 13, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 10, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 03, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Service by Publication]
  • March 12, 2025: [Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction]
  • March 10, 2025: [Affidavit]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.