U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00345
  • Case Name: Ploss v. Community Health Center, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 24, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • April 24, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 24, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Proposed Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 09, 2025: [Remand to State Court]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 17, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order of Transfer]
  • March 11, 2025: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Standing Protective Order (Intake)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • March 11, 2025: [NEW Case Assignment]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice re: Disclosure Statement]
  • March 10, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.