U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00315
  • Case Name: Stenquist v. Target Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 15, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 04, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 01, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • March 15, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
  • March 15, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 15, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 11, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 11, 2025: [Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.