U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00336
  • Case Name: Daigle et al v. Walmart Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • May 05, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • May 05, 2025: [Appearance Self Represented Party]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • April 10, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Extension of Time]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice]
  • March 21, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • March 13, 2025: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 13, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 11, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 11, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.