U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01981
  • Case Name: Wingster v. Cyr
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • May 08, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 06, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • May 06, 2025: [Response]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Default Entry 55(a)]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Default Entry 55(a)]
  • April 28, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 18, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 18, 2025: [Response]
  • April 07, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 07, 2025: [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • April 03, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • April 03, 2025: [Response]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 24, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 19, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 19, 2025: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 18, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 13, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Pre-Filing Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.