U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00354
  • Case Name: Martinka v. Swing Completo LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • May 01, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Settlement]
  • April 18, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 17, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 15, 2025: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 13, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • March 13, 2025: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake)]
  • March 13, 2025: [Standing Protective Order (Intake)]
  • March 13, 2025: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • March 12, 2025: [NEW Case Assignment]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice re: Disclosure Statement]
  • March 12, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 12, 2025: [Report on Copyright Form]
  • March 12, 2025: [Request to Issue Summons]
  • March 12, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.