U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00360
  • Case Name: Watson v. Dudek
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Social Security Transcripts]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Order of Transfer]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Recommended Ruling]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • March 18, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 17, 2025: [Recommended Ruling]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [SSA Cases - Notice of New Action]
  • March 14, 2025: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • March 14, 2025: [SSA Cases - Notice to Counsel]
  • March 14, 2025: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [SSA Cases - Standing Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [SSA Cases - Standing Order re: Assignment]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Appearance - Commissioner]
  • March 13, 2025: [NEW Case Assignment]
  • March 12, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 12, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.