U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00357
  • Case Name: Martinez v. Makita USA, Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • April 02, 2025: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 17, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 17, 2025: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Standing Protective Order (Intake)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • March 13, 2025: [NEW Case Assignment]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 12, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.