U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00358
  • Case Name: Rodriguez v. Community Health Center, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Remand to State Court]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order of Transfer]
  • March 14, 2025: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Standing Protective Order (Intake)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • March 12, 2025: [NEW Case Assignment]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice re: Disclosure Statement]
  • March 12, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.