U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00115
  • Case Name: Felix v. Masonicare Home Health and Hospice, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • April 28, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 21, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement]
  • March 20, 2025: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 18, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • March 12, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.