U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00355
  • Case Name: Guerrero v. United Seating and Mobility, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Extension of Time]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 08, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • April 08, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 14, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • March 14, 2025: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Standing Protective Order (Intake)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • March 13, 2025: [NEW Case Assignment]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice re: Disclosure Statement]
  • March 12, 2025: [Request to Issue Summons]
  • March 12, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.