U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00206
  • Case Name: Connelly v. Tong et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 24, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 24, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 21, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • March 12, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.