U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00054
  • Case Name: J. et al v. Region 18 Schools Board of Education et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Memorandum of Conference]
  • May 07, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 07, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • May 07, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • May 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • April 11, 2025: [Response]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 12, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.