U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00327
  • Case Name: Brown v. State of Connecticut
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • May 01, 2025: [Extension of Time]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Transfer / Disqualify / Recuse Judge]
  • April 30, 2025: [Contempt]
  • April 30, 2025: [Sanctions]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 21, 2025: [Extension of Time]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 12, 2025: [Document Forwarded to the Court of Appeals]
  • March 12, 2025: [Affidavit]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.