U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00814
  • Case Name: Carmona v. Silva et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 08, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 17, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 20, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 13, 2025: [Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.