U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-01123
  • Case Name: Geenty v. Pasta Technologies Group SRL
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 06, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Conference]
  • April 23, 2025: [Response]
  • April 17, 2025: [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Conference]
  • April 09, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Stipulation]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 25, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 14, 2025: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 13, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 13, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.