U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00303
  • Case Name: Jobete Music Company, Inc. et al v. Sicily Coal LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement]
  • May 06, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
  • March 31, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 31, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 31, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 17, 2025: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.