U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00098
  • Case Name: Sorrentino v. Fay Servicing, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 31, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 27, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Objection]
  • March 13, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.