U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01785
  • Case Name: Cadet v. H.N.S. Management Company, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 25, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 18, 2025: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 13, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 13, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.