U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00055
  • Case Name: In re: The Nash Engineering Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 08, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Compliance with Pretrial Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 04, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • April 04, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 21, 2025: [Objection]
  • March 20, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 19, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 13, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 13, 2025: [Objection]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.