U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-30208
  • Case Name: David M Journalist
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Financial Management Course Certificate - eFinCert]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Notice Re: Trustees Final Report and Final Account]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Closed]
March, 2025
  • March 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Form 122 - Means Test]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Form 122 - Means Test]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.