U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-02001
  • Case Name: Dunkerley v. U.S. Dept. of Education
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order of Judgment]
  • April 30, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Stipulated Order]
  • April 28, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Approve Stipulation]
  • April 23, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 21, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generate BNC Notice/Form]
  • April 21, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Continue Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 16, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 13, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generate BNC Notice/Form]
  • March 13, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Scheduling Order/Pretrial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.