U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-50757
  • Case Name: Laquisha Gayle McFarlane
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Notice Re: Trustees Final Report and Final Account]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (batch)]
April, 2025
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Hearing Held]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Digital Audio Recording]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Certificate/Affidavit of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Notice]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Closed]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Continue Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Certificate/Affidavit of Service]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.