U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00370
  • Case Name: Walker v. Fairfield University
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 21, 2025: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 20, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 19, 2025: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 18, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 18, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 17, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • March 17, 2025: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • March 17, 2025: [Standing Order re: Letters]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice re: Initial Discovery Protocols]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Standing Protective Order (Intake)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • March 14, 2025: [NEW Case Assignment]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice re: Disclosure Statement]
  • March 14, 2025: [Request to Issue Summons]
  • March 14, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.