U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00323
  • Case Name: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Report on Copyright Form]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 14, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.