U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00126
  • Case Name: Cole Investment IX, LLC v. E Brands, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • April 29, 2025: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
  • April 08, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.