U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00246
  • Case Name: Faniola v. Mauro Motors, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement]
  • April 23, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • April 07, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 14, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.