U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00371
  • Case Name: Tedone v. Community Health Center, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 15, 2025: [Remand to State Court]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 27, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 21, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 20, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order of Transfer]
  • March 17, 2025: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • March 17, 2025: [Standing Protective Order (Intake)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • March 14, 2025: [NEW Case Assignment]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice re: Disclosure Statement]
  • March 14, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.